Crenshaw v. Stitt et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Cordell Crenshaw
Defendant: Kevin Stitt, Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board and Getner Drummond
Case Number: 5:2023cv00247
Filed: March 17, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Amanda Maxfield Green
Referring Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Alter Judgment by Courtney Cordell Crenshaw. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned recommends that the court DENY Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP (Doc. 2). The undersigned further recommends that if Plaintiff does not pay the $402.00 filing fee in full to the Clerk of the Court within 21 days of any order adopting this Report and Recommendation, that this action be dismissed without prejudice to the refiling. Objections to R&R due by 5/19/2023 This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 4/28/2023. (rb)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ~ re #5 Report and Recommendation. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation as to Plaintiff's first claim and DISMISSES Plaintiff's first claim without prejudice as a request for habeas relief; The Court DECLINES TO ADOPT the Report and Recommendation as to Plaintiff's second claim; and The Court REFERS this case back to Judge Green for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 4/26/2023. (dwl)
April 19, 2023 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendation by Courtney Cordell Crenshaw. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa).
March 31, 2023 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Rhe undersigned recommends that the Court DISMISS without prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) as a request for habeas relief and DENY as moot Plaintiff's pending IFP Application. Objections to R&R due by 4/21/2023. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 3/31/2023. (rb)
March 17, 2023 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Motions referred to Amanda Maxfield Green.Signed by the direction of Judge Bernard M. Jones on 03/17/2023. (naa)
March 17, 2023 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases (naa)
March 17, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Courtney Cordell Crenshaw. Attachment #1 Attachment 1 - Offender Statement, #2 Envelope) (naa)
March 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Getner Drummond, Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, Kevin Stitt filed by Courtney Cordell Crenshaw. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crenshaw v. Stitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Cordell Crenshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getner Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?