Williamson v. Stitt et al
Plaintiff: Donald Williamson
Defendant: Kevin Stitt, Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board and Gentner Drummond
Case Number: 5:2023cv00272
Filed: March 27, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Amanda Maxfield Green
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's Order entered this date, Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 05/03/2023. (km)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #5 Report and Recommendation. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's pending #2 IFP application is denied as moot. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 05/03/2023. (km)
March 31, 2023 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned recommends that the Court DISMISS without prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) as a request for habeas relief and DENY as moot Plaintiff's pending IFP Application (Doc. 2). Objections to R&R due by 4/21/2023. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 3/31/2023. (rb)
March 27, 2023 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Motions referred to Amanda Maxfield Green. Signed by the direction of Judge David L. Russell on 03/27/2023. (naa)
March 27, 2023 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases (naa)
March 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Offender Statement Report, #2 Envelope)(naa)
March 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Getner Drummond, Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, Kevin Stitt filed by Donald Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Stitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentner Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?