Strover v. Mears Group Inc
Plaintiff: Paul Strover
Defendant: Mears Group Inc
Case Number: 5:2023cv00427
Filed: May 15, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Mears Group Inc.(Bru, Courtney)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Courtney L Bru on behalf of Mears Group Inc (Bru, Courtney)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Strover. Mears Group Inc served on 5/18/2023. (Irwin, Jonathan)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Receipt for Money Received from Paul Strover in the amount of $402, receipt number 500002121 regarding #1 Complaint. Receipt emailed to TJ@wardglasslaw.com (dtb)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mears Group Inc. (ekw)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mears Group Inc filed by Paul Strover. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ekw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strover v. Mears Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Strover
Represented By: Jonathan M Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mears Group Inc
Represented By: Courtney L Bru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?