Seals v. Rankins
Petitioner: Curtis Bernard Seals
Respondent: Chris Rankins
Case Number: 5:2023cv00737
Filed: August 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Amanda Maxfield Green
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline EJ Hunt on behalf of Chris Rankins (Hunt, Caroline)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER For Response #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Curtis Bernard Seals, #2 Brief filed by Curtis Bernard Seals. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 10/2/2023. (rb)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE-REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green.. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/21/2023. (jee)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis;. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/20/2023. (jee)
September 19, 2023 Filing 8 Receipt for Money Received from Curtis Bernard Seals in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 500003631 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Mailed receipt to Curtis Bernard Seals #508080 GRANITE-OSR P O Box 514 Granite, OK 73547 (ekw)
August 28, 2023 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned recommends that the court DENY Petitioner's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP (Doc. 6). Objections to R&R due by 9/18/2023. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 8/28/2023. (rb)
August 25, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Curtis Bernard Seals. Motions referred to Amanda Maxfield Green. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Account Information, #2 Attachment 2 - Cleveland County Notice of Post Conviction Appeal, #3 Envelope)(ekw)
August 18, 2023 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Signed by the direction of Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 08/18/2023. (naa)
August 18, 2023 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Judge Bernard M. Jones no longer assigned to case Signed by the direction of Judge Bernard M. Jones on 08/18/2023. (naa)
August 18, 2023 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (naa)
August 18, 2023 Filing 2 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (naa)
August 18, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Curtis Bernard Seals. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seals v. Rankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curtis Bernard Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chris Rankins
Represented By: Caroline EJ Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?