Fiorito v. LNU
Petitioner: Michael Fiorito
Respondent: FNU LNU
Case Number: 5:2023cv00834
Filed: September 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Referring Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2023 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Fiorito. The undersigned recommends the Court deny Petitioner's IFP application. Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2023. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues and terminates the referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/17/23. (lb)
October 16, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Fiorito. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Cure Deficiency by 10/12/23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 9/21/23. (lb)
September 20, 2023 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by the direction of Judge Bernard M. Jones on 09/20/2023. (naa)
September 20, 2023 Filing 2 NO PREVIOUS Cases (naa)
September 20, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiorito v. LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Fiorito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?