Sims v. Hosch et al
Plaintiff: Tommy L Sims
Defendant: Jason Hosch and State Farm Insurance
Case Number: 5:2023cv01022
Filed: November 13, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant State Farm Insurance re #3 Order Reassigning Case, #4 MOTION to Dismiss , #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #2 Order of Recusal, #1 Notice of Removal, (Morris, Andrew)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Braden M Hoffmann on behalf of State Farm Insurance (Hoffmann, Braden)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica L Dickerson on behalf of State Farm Insurance (Dickerson, Jessica)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Insurance /State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Morris, Andrew)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Insurance /State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Morris, Andrew)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew James Morris on behalf of State Farm Insurance (Morris, Andrew)
November 20, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Insurance.(Morris, Andrew)
November 20, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Jason Hosch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hosch Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hosch Agency Record from OK Secretary of State)(Morris, Andrew)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER. Case reassigned to Judge Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. HEREAFTER, PLEASE REFER TO CASE AS: CIV-23-01022-G. Entered at the direction of Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 11/13/2023. (nv)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RECUSAL ORDER Judge Jodi W. Dishman recused. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to place this case number in the random draw for reassignment to another Judge of the Court. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 11/13/2023. (nv)
November 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Comanche County District Court, case number CJ-2023-486 filed by State Farm Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hosch Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Depo Subpoena, #4 Exhibit 4 - Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5 - Fire Policy, #6 Exhibit 6 - Auto Policy, #7 Exhibit 7 - Return of Service Hosch, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(rp)
November 13, 2023 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4293363. (Morris, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Hosch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy L Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hosch
Represented By: Andrew James Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance
Represented By: Andrew James Morris
Represented By: Braden M Hoffmann
Represented By: Jessica L Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?