Farnes et al v. TJ Inspections Inc
Plaintiff: Wesley Farnes
Defendant: TJ Inspections Inc
Case Number: 5:2023cv01100
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by All Plaintiffs. (Taylor, Jeffery)
December 13, 2023 Filing 6 Receipt for Money Received from Plaintiff Wesley Farnes in the amount of $3.00, receipt number 500004858 regarding #1 Complaint. Receipt emailed to taylorjeff@me.com (kb)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 defendant's unopposed motion to extend responsive pleading deadline and extending the deadline to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 12/8/2023. (ks)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by TJ Inspections Inc. (Pittman, Ryan)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit consent Farnes)(Taylor, Jeffery)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to TJ Inspections Inc. (kb)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TJ Inspections Inc filed by Wesley Farnes (Individually), Wesley Farnes (On behalf of others similarly situated ). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kb)
December 1, 2023 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4306541. (Taylor, Jeffery)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farnes et al v. TJ Inspections Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Farnes
Represented By: Jeffery A Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ Inspections Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?