English v. Vital Systems Specialty Care LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sybil D English
Defendant: Vital Systems Specialty Care LLC, Vital Systems Specialty Care Inc, Vital Systems of Oklahoma Inc and Larissa Bowker
Case Number: 5:2024cv00065
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #6 Defendant Larissa Bowker's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Bowker are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may still seek leave to amend her Complaint from this Court or Defendant with respect to these causes of action. However, Plaintiff should do so only if such amendment will cure the defects the Court has identified. See Order for details. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 02/29/2024. (km)
February 23, 2024 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Larissa Bowker's Partial Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Brief Defendant Larissa Bowker's Reply to Plaintiff's Objection and Response to Defendant Larissa Bowker's Partial Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Larissa Bowker. (Turner, Elaine)
February 16, 2024 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendants Vital Systems of Oklahoma, Inc. and Vital Systems Specialty Care, LLC by Vital Systems Specialty Care LLC, Vital Systems of Oklahoma Inc.(Turner, Elaine)
February 16, 2024 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Vital Systems of Oklahoma Inc Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Turner, Elaine)
February 16, 2024 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Vital Systems Specialty Care LLC Disclosure Statement Identifying Constituents of LLC. (Turner, Elaine)
February 16, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Larissa Bowker's Partial Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Brief filed by Sybil D English. (Grubb, Benjamin)
February 2, 2024 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Myriah S Downs on behalf of Sybil D English (Downs, Myriah). Modified on 2/5/2024; document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made. (naa)
February 2, 2024 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sybil D English. (Grubb, Benjamin)
February 2, 2024 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin R Grubb on behalf of Sybil D English (Grubb, Benjamin)
January 26, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendants Vital Systems of Oklahoma, Inc. and Vital Systems Specialty Care, LLC by Vital Systems Specialty Care Inc, Vital Systems Specialty Care LLC, Vital Systems of Oklahoma Inc.(Turner, Elaine)
January 26, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Larissa Bowker's Partial Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Brief by Larissa Bowker. (Turner, Elaine)
January 22, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUIREMENTS TO GIVE NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Turner, Elaine)
January 22, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by All Defendants Notice of Pending Motions (Turner, Elaine)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Hilary H Price on behalf of All Defendants (Price, Hilary)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Elaine R Turner on behalf of All Defendants (Turner, Elaine)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Canadian County District Court, case number CJ-2023-841 filed by Vital Systems Specialty Care Inc, Vital Systems Specialty Care LLC, Vital Systems of Oklahoma Inc, Larissa Bowker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons of Vital Systems of Oklahoma Inc, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons of Vital Systems Specialty Care LLC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons of Vital Systems Specialty Care INC, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons of Larissa Bowker, #6 Exhibit 6 - Filing Summons of Vital Systems of Oklahoma Inc, #7 Exhibit 7 - Filing Summons of Vital Systems Specialty Care Inc, #8 Exhibit 8 - Filing Summons of Larissa Bowker, #9 Exhibit 9 - OSCN Docket Sheet, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(ekw)
January 19, 2024 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4339394. (Turner, Elaine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: English v. Vital Systems Specialty Care LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sybil D English
Represented By: Benjamin R Grubb
Represented By: Myriah S Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Systems Specialty Care LLC
Represented By: Elaine R Turner
Represented By: Hilary H Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Systems Specialty Care Inc
Represented By: Elaine R Turner
Represented By: Hilary H Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Systems of Oklahoma Inc
Represented By: Elaine R Turner
Represented By: Hilary H Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larissa Bowker
Represented By: Elaine R Turner
Represented By: Hilary H Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?