Daly v. Cole
Petitioner: Richard Daly
Respondent: D. C. Cole
Case Number: 5:2024cv00445
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Amanda Maxfield Green
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 Filing 12 Receipt for Money Received from Richard Daly in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 500007417 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Receipt mailed to Richard Daly #676270 LAWTON-LCRF 8-C-122 8607 SE Flower Mound Rd Lawton, OK 73501 (ekw)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of USCA. Denied; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished. Final order filed by Judges Bacharach, Moritz and Eid denying Mr. Daly's motion for authorization to file another 2254 application. [24-6106] (ekw)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Denying #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Richard Daly. If Petitioner does not pay the $5.00 filing fee in full to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of this Order, this action may be dismissed without prejudice to refiling. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is RE-REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green for further proceedings consistent with the initial case referral. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/4/2024. (jee)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of USCA. Case docketed. Petition for permission to file successive 2254 habeas petition in district court. DATE RECEIVED: 05/24/2024 [24-6106] (ekw)
May 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION titled, "Petitioner's Motion for a Stay of Habeas Proceeding for 90 Days" by Richard Daly. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Petition/Motion to 10th Cir. Ct. of Appeals, for Permission to File a Second Successive Habeas Petition, #2 Attachment 2 - Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28:2254, #3 Attachment 3 - Transcript of Plea in Comanche County, #4 Envelope)(ekw)
May 22, 2024 Filing 7 LETTER from Richard Daly (ekw)
May 7, 2024 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned recommends that the court DENY Petitioner's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP (Doc. 2). Objections to R&R due by 5/28/2024. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/7/2024. (rb)
May 3, 2024 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Motions referred to Amanda Maxfield Green. Signed by the direction of Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 05/03/2024. (kb)
May 3, 2024 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick R Wyrick no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 05/03/2024. (kb)
May 3, 2024 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (kb)
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Daly. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Inmate Account History, #2 Attachment 2 - Offender Statement Report, #3 Envelope)(kb)
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Richard Daly. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit 1 - Letter, #3 Exhibit 2 - Supporting Documents, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Documents, #5 Envelope)(kb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daly v. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. C. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?