Goff v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: Jamarco Goff
Defendant: Oklahoma County Detention Facility, FNU McDaniels and FNU Washington
Case Number: 5:2024cv01287
Filed: December 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Amanda Maxfield Green
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the authorized jail official(s) at the Oklahoma County Detention Center appropriately calculate and execute the Statement of Institutional Accounts included with Plaintiff's second IFP Application, as well as attach a certified copy of the supporting institutional account statement(s), and return the completed IFP Application (Doc. 7) to this court by January 28, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 1/7/2025. (rb)
December 30, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamarco Goff. Motions referred to Amanda Maxfield Green. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Supporting Document, #2 Envelope)(alw)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. Accordingly, the Court orders Plaintiff to cure the deficiencies designated above on or before January 3, 2025. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff the necessary forms to comply with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 12/13/2024. (cps)
December 11, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamarco Goff. Motions referred to Amanda Maxfield Green. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(alw)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Cure Deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 12/11/2024. (rb)
December 10, 2024 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Entered at the direction of Judge Scott L. Palk on 12/10/2024. (alw)
December 9, 2024 Filing 2 NO PREVIOUS Cases (alw)
December 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU McDaniels, Oklahoma County Detention Facility, FNU Washington filed by Jamarco Goff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(alw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goff v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamarco Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?