Wilburn v. United States
Petitioner: Andre Wilburn
Respondent: United States
Case Number: 5:2025cv00065
Filed: January 15, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2025 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Andre Wilburn, as to Andre Wilburn (Attachments: #1 Attachment Andre Wilburn) (llr)
March 12, 2025 Docket Annotation: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in Northern District of West Virginia as case 5:25-cv-00057, filed 03/12/2025. (rp)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER- this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. The Clerk of Court is directed to take all necessary steps to effectuate the transfer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pending Report and Recommendation [Doc. No. 7] is deemed MOOT. Petitioners pending motions [Doc. Nos. 4, 5, 8] are deferred for a ruling, if necessary, by the transferee court. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/10/2025. (jee)
March 10, 2025 Docket Annotation: This case has been sent to the Northern District of West Virgina (jee)
March 3, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time by Andre Wilburn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for Petitioner's failure to comply with this Court's orders. Adoption of this recommendation would render moot both Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and his Motion to Transfer Case. ECF Nos. #4 and #5 . This report and recommendation terminates the referral to the undersigned magistrate judge unless and until the matter is re-referred. Objections to R&R due by 3/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 2/26/2025. (mc)
February 26, 2025 Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc)
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER -- The Court is in receipt of the documents Petitioner tendered in the above-referenced matter. However, the documents are deficient in the area(s) indicated. Petitioner shall cure the deficiencies designated above by February 18, 2025. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/30/2025. (mc)
January 27, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case by Andre Wilburn. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)
January 27, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Andre Wilburn. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)
January 15, 2025 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/15/2025. (naa)
January 15, 2025 Filing 2 NO PREVIOUS Cases (naa)
January 15, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Andre Wilburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(naa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilburn v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andre Wilburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?