Worcester v. Oklahoma State of
Petitioner: Hokte Worcester
Respondent: Oklahoma State of
Case Number: 5:2025cv00066
Filed: January 15, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2025 Filing 7 JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/11/2025. (jee)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION The action is DISMISSED without prejudice to refiling. A separate Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/11/2025. (jee)
February 12, 2025 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned recommends that the Court DISMISS this case without prejudice to the re-filing. Objections to R&R due by 3/5/2025. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 2/12/2025. (rb)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Cure Deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 1/17/2025. (rb)
January 15, 2025 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/15/2025. (naa)
January 15, 2025 Filing 2 NO PREVIOUS Cases (naa)
January 15, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Hokte Worcester. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worcester v. Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hokte Worcester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?