Boronda v. Moye et al

Defendant: Josephine County and Sara Moye
Plaintiff: Michael A. Boronda
Case Number: 1:2011cv03082
Filed: July 21, 2011
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Medford Office
Presiding Judge: Mark D. Clarke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2617 Family and Medical Leave Act Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 4 ); Granting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 11 ); Adopting Magistrate Judge Clarke's Report and Recommendation 25 . Signed on 2/16/2012 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (dkj)
July 27, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting Report and Recommendation 41 ; Granting in Part Denying in Part Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 36 . Amended Complaint is due w/in 10 days. Ordered & Signed on 7/27/12 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (kf)
March 7, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting Magistrate Judge Clarke's Report and Recommendation 66 ; Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 52 . Signed on 3/7/2013 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (dkj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boronda v. Moye et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Moye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Boronda
Represented By: David C. Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.