Godwin v. Rogue Valley Youth Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Godwin
Defendant: City of Grants Pass, John and Jane Doe, Ken Jerin, Oregon Youth Authority, Colette Peter, Rogue Valley Youth Correctional Facility and Jean Straight
Case Number: 1:2012cv00478
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Medford (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Mark D. Clarke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 OPINION AND ORDER: State Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, 130 , is GRANTED on the basis of qualified immunity. As the granting of Defendants motion will dispose of all claims and defendants remaining in the case, all other pending motions are denied as moot and final judgment shall be entered. Signed on 8/31/2017 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) Modified on 8/31/2017 to add the word Opinion to the docket text(cp).
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: Adopting Findings and Recommendation 98 . Denying State Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 70 as to Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Ken Jerin and Jean Straight and Granted as to Plaintiff's First Amendment claims; Granting Motion for Summary Judgment 73 ; Denying Motion 87 . Signed on 12/20/2013 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (dkj)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: Adopting Report and Recommendation 62 ; Granting Plaintiff's due process and equal protection claims, and Denying Plaintiff's First Amendment Retaliation claim on Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 28 . Signed on 7/12/2013 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (dkj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godwin v. Rogue Valley Youth Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Grants Pass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Jerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Youth Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colette Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogue Valley Youth Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Straight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Godwin
Represented By: M. Christian Bottoms
Represented By: Samuel I. Hochberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?