Navagium Vectorium, LLC, et al v. Sutton, et al

Plaintiff: Navagium Vectorium, LLC, Outfitter Aviation, LLC and Outfitter Rotary, LLC
Defendant: Outfitter Aviation Oregon, LLC and Roger Sutton
Case Number: 1:2013cv00162
Filed: January 29, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Medford (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Mark D. Clarke
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2016 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Ordered and Signed on 02/03/2016 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
October 14, 2015 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law from Bench Trial. The Court orders the parties to work together to submit a proposed judgment by November 11, 2015. Ordered and Signed on 10/14/2015 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
May 19, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Denying Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 84 ). Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Ordered and Signed on 05/19/2015 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 3, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If Plaintiffs post a $34,000 bond, the court grants Plaintiffs' motion 50 . If the bond is not posted, the court denies Plaintiffs' motion and orders the parties to cooperate to maintain and, if possible, insure the aircraft during the pendency of this case. Defendants shall allow Plaintiffs' mechanics to inspect and maintain the Bonanza as needed. Ordered and Signed on 07/03/2014 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navagium Vectorium, LLC, et al v. Sutton, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navagium Vectorium, LLC
Represented By: Bernard S. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outfitter Aviation, LLC
Represented By: Bernard S. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outfitter Rotary, LLC
Represented By: Bernard S. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outfitter Aviation Oregon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?