Alo v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Cheryl L. Alo
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2016cv00180
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Medford (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Anna J. Brown
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Granting Motion for Attorney Fees 29 . Signed on 1/5/21 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached Order. (bb)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Granting Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 26 . Signed on 7/17/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Opinion and Order. The Court AFFIRMS the decision of the Commissioner and DISMISSES this matter. Signed on 05/08/2017 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached 17 page Opinion and Order for full text. (bb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alo v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl L. Alo
Represented By: Katherine Eitenmiller
Represented By: Mark A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Janice E. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?