Lovette v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Gregory Lovette
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv01608
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/3/2018, answer due on 1/31/2019. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Haapala, John)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #5 . Signed on 9/26/2018 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (eo)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 Amended Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Gregory Lovette. (Haapala, John)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #2 is denied with leave to renew. Plaintiff failed to submit any detailed responses regarding his finances, including the existence of any regular monthly expenses (despite indicating that his girlfriend is financially dependent on him for support). The court is unable to grant IFP status without this information. Any Amended Application to Proceed Informa Pauperis is due 10/10/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (jk)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (jkm)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Gregory Lovette. (Haapala, John)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Gregory Lovette against Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Haapala, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovette v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lovette
Represented By: John E. Haapala, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?