Bracken v. Florida League of Cities et al
Plaintiff: Corey L. Bracken
Defendant: City of Jasper, Florida, Axon Corporation, city of Jasper Police Department, Florida, Florida League of Cities and Loves Travel Centers
Case Number: 1:2019cv00602
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Medford (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Corey L. Bracken regarding Scheduling 6 , Order,, #5 . (jkm)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Order,, #5 . Amended Complaint is due 5/24/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order regarding Complaint #1 . Plaintiffs Complaint (#1) is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to refile an Amended Complaint within thirty days of this ruling. Plaintiff must cure the deficiencies identified above or his case will be dismissed. Additionally, Plaintiffs requests for appointment of pro bono counsel and to seal the case are both denied. Plaintiffs IFP application (#2) is held in abeyance and will be considered when the amended complaint is filed. Signed on 4/24/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm) Modified on 4/25/2019 (jkm). To reflect Opinion.
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Corey L. Bracken regarding Case Assignment Notice #3 . (jkm)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Corey L. Bracken. (jkm)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Corey L. Bracken against All Defendants. (jkm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bracken v. Florida League of Cities et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jasper, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: city of Jasper Police Department, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida League of Cities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loves Travel Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey L. Bracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?