Adams v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Dwayne B. Adams
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00965
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order referring Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 , Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 should be Granted #10 to Judge Aiken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 should be Granted. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 8/28/2019. Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Signed on 08/14/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Supplemental Notice re Sur-Reply to Motion #8 Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s): Sur-Reply to Motion #8 .) (Marshall, Ann)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Sur-Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 , Response to Motion #6 . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Marshall, Ann)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Marshall, Ann)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 . Filed by Dwayne B. Adams. (Billin, Richard)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Notice re Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 .) (Marshall, Ann)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Marshall, Ann)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order, #2 . Dispositive Motions are due by 11/18/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/21/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/18/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/18/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV21488 from Jackson County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5898144 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Marshall, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Ann T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne B. Adams
Represented By: Richard L. Billin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?