Fitzgerald et al v. Marical et al
Plaintiff: D.F. and Aubrey Fitzgerald
Defendant: Scott Marical, Suzanne Cutler, Benjamin Bloom, Deena Harris, Leilani Humphries, Kerry Avalon, Kelly Packard, George Monty, Wendy Shumway, Amanda Roberson and Patricia Crain
Case Number: 1:2019cv01074
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Opinion and Order re Complaint #1 , Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #6 . The Complaint (#1) is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff's IFP application (#6) is held in abeyance and will be reconsidered upon the filing of an amended complaint. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30)days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. Amended complaint due 10/7/2019. (Copy of this Order sent to Plaintiff) Signed on 9/6/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Aubrey Fitzgerald. (jkm)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Aubrey Fitzgerald. (rsm)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Aubrey Fitzgerald. (rsm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Case Assignment Notice #2 sent to Aubrey Fitzgerald returned as undeliverable. (jkm)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Aubrey Fitzgerald regarding Case Assignment Notice #2 . (jkm)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. (NO IFP, NO FILING FEE PAID, NO CIVIL COVER SHEET). Filed by Aubrey Fitzgerald against All Defendants (jkm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald et al v. Marical et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Marical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deena Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leilani Humphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Avalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Packard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Monty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?