Doe et al v. Medford School District 549C et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Warner, John Doe and Chris Warner
Defendant: Chellie Stoffell, Medford School District 549C, Megan Young, Lowell Krieg and Julia Curiel
Case Number: 1:2019cv01395
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 29:0794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition #11 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (Howry, John)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #9 .Defendant's Answer is due by 10/23/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Jacobson, Rebekah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Megan Young. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Chellie Stoffell. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lowell Krieg. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Julia Curiel. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Medford School District 549C. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order, #2 . Dispositive Motions are due by 2/3/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/6/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/3/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/3/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5984990 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Chris Warner, Kimberly Warner, John Doe against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons). (Howry, John) Modified on 9/6/2019 to add receipt information(cw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Medford School District 549C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chellie Stoffell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medford School District 549C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowell Krieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Curiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?