Ziemer v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tabitha E. Ziemer
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv01691
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Ann L. Aiken to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (eo)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge..
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 11/4/2019, answer due on 3/3/2020. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Evans, H.)
October 24, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $400.00 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6052071. (jn)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rsm)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP petition indicates both an ability and willingness to pay the filing fee. Accordingly, the petition #2 is DENIED. Filing Fee must be paid by 11/21/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Tabitha E. Ziemer. (Evans, H.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Tabitha E. Ziemer against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Evans, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziemer v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha E. Ziemer
Represented By: H. Peter Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?