Hinnewinkel v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Katrina Hinnewinkel
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation and C. R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01415
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 157 Notice of Appearance of Leslie W. O'Leary appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (O'Leary, Leslie)
October 9, 2020 Filing 156 Joint Status Report . Filed by All Defendants. (French, Pilar)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #154 . Attorney Eric W. Swanis for C.R. Bard Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
October 2, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Eric W. Swanis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7307239 #154 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
October 2, 2020 Filing 154 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Eric W. Swanis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7307239. Filed by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (French, Pilar)
September 29, 2020 Filing 152 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (French, Pilar)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held. After conferring with the parties and reviewing this case, Judge Clarke will continue to preside over this case and requests that the parties confer and submit a proposed case scheduled by 10/09/2020. Sheila Bossier present as counsel for plaintiff. Nancy Erfle, Joe Winebrenner, Daniel Kirby, Mildred Segura and Pilar French present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Hearing was not recorded. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
September 28, 2020 Filing 151 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Erfle, Nancy)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #149 byMagistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
September 25, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Mark Joseph Winebrenner. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7279085 #149 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
September 25, 2020 Filing 149 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Mark Joseph Winebrenner. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7279085. Filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Winebrenner, Mark)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #147 by attorney Kate Elizabeth Middleton for the purposes of representing Boston Scientific Corporation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (cw)
September 10, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kate E. Middleton. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7196584 #147 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
September 4, 2020 Filing 147 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kate E. Middleton. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7196584. Filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Middleton, Kate)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. A telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 9/28/2020 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Teleconference information to be provided in a separate entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
September 2, 2020 Filing 145 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #144 Withdrawal of Attorney. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The PDF attached at filing did not conform to LR 10-2. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. (eo)
September 2, 2020 Filing 144 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Derek H. Potts and Calsie M. Boyd Filed by Katrina Hinnewinkel. (Bossier, Sheila) (Main Document 144 replaced on 9/2/2020) (eo).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sheila M. Bossier for Katrina Hinnewinkel #142 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 26, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Sheila M. Bossier. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7159486 #142 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 142 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Sheila M. Bossier. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7159486. Filed by Katrina Hinnewinkel. (Bossier, Sheila)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael K. Brown for C.R. Bard, Inc. #137 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 25, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael Brown. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7153275 #137 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel C. Kirby for C.R. Bard, Inc. #136 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 25, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel Kirby. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7153259 #136 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Marilyn A. Moberg for C.R. Bard, Inc. #135 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 25, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Marilyn Moberg. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7153239 #135 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mildred Segura for C.R. Bard, Inc. #134 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 25, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Mildred Segura. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7153175 #134 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
August 25, 2020 Filing 137 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael Brown. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7153275. Filed by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (French, Pilar)
August 25, 2020 Filing 136 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel Kirby. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7153259. Filed by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (French, Pilar)
August 25, 2020 Filing 135 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Marilyn Moberg. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7153239. Filed by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (French, Pilar)
August 25, 2020 Filing 134 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Mildred Segura. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7153175. Filed by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (French, Pilar)
August 25, 2020 Filing 133 Notice of Appearance of Pilar C. French appearing on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc. Filed by on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (French, Pilar)
August 20, 2020 Filing 132 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of Attorneys James H. Keale, Michael A. Tanenbaum, Jon A. Strongman and Michael Bonasso Filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Erfle, Nancy)
August 20, 2020 Filing 131 Notice of Appearance of Nancy M. Erfle appearing on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation Filed by on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Erfle, Nancy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 130 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (eo)
August 19, 2020 Filing 129 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the District of Southern District of West Virginia (Charleston). Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document Case Transferred In - District Transfer #128 . (eo)
August 19, 2020 Filing 128 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:17-cv-04127. Electronic file received.
August 18, 2020 Filing 127 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 7017 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior MTE Margolis, #2 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s MTE Margolis and Memo in Support, #3 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh A, #4 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh B, #5 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh C, #6 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh D, #7 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh E, #8 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh F, #9 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh G, #10 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh H, #11 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh I, #12 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh J, #13 Exhibit ECF 7046 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Response re Margolis, #14 Exhibit ECF 4960 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Margolis, #15 Exhibit ECF 6035 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Margolis, #16 Exhibit ECF 8457 - Bard_s MTE Reeves, #17 Exhibit ECF 8457 - Ex A, #18 Exhibit ECF 8457 - Ex B, #19 Exhibit ECF 8457 - Ex C, #20 Exhibit ECF 8457 - Ex D, #21 Exhibit ECF 8458 - Bard_s MOL ISO MTE Reeves, #22 Exhibit ECF 8459 - Bard_s Not of Adoption of MTE re El Ghannam, #23 Exhibit ECF 8459 - Ex A, #24 Exhibit ECF 8459 - Ex B, #25 Exhibit ECF 8459 - Ex C, #26 Exhibit ECF 8459 - Ex D, #27 Exhibit ECF 8459 - Ex E, #28 Exhibit ECF 8459 - Ex F, #29 Exhibit ECF 8478 - Bard_s Reply ISO MTE Reeves, #30 Exhibit ECF 8479 - Bard_s Notice of Adoption of Reply ISO re El Ghannam, #31 Exhibit ECF 8479 - Ex A, #32 Exhibit ECF 198-1 - Master Complaint, #33 Exhibit ECF 198-2 - Short Form Complaint, #34 Exhibit ECF 198-3 - Bard's Answer to Master Complaint, #35 Exhibit ECF 352 - Master Long Form Complaint, #36 Exhibit ECF 353 - Short Form Complaint, #37 Exhibit ECF 354 - Am Short Form Complaint, #38 Exhibit ECF 355 - Bard's Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #39 Exhibit ECF 359 - Bard's Mot to Amend Short Form Complaint, #40 Exhibit ECF 643 - Bard's Not of Subpoena - Otto Fisher, #41 Exhibit ECF 644 - Bard's Not of Subpoena - D Christensen, #42 Exhibit ECF 645 - Bard's Not of Subpoena - MedStar Funding, #43 Exhibit ECF 646 - Bard's Not of Subpoena - One Point Orthopedic & Neurosurgical Grp, #44 Exhibit ECF 689 - Short Form Complaint, #45 Exhibit ECF 690 - Am Short Form Complaint, #46 Exhibit ECF 692 - Bard's Not of Subpoena - One Point Orthopedic & Neurosurgical Grp, #47 Exhibit ECF 709 - Bard's Not of Dep - Chevron Phillips Chem Co, #48 Exhibit ECF 742 - Bard's Not of Subpoena - Otto Fisher, #49 Exhibit ECF 771 - Bard's 2d Am Not of Subpoena - D Christensen, #50 Exhibit ECF 787 - Bard's Am Not of Dep - Chevron Phillips Chem Co, #51 Exhibit ECF 892 - Bard's Not of Subpoena - MedStar Funding, #52 Exhibit ECF 4567 - Bard's Not of Adopt - El Ghannam Daubert Mot in Wave 4, #53 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Bard's Daubert Mot - Margolis, #54 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex A, #55 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex B, #56 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex C, #57 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex D, #58 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex E, #59 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex F, #60 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex G, #61 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex H, #62 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex I, #63 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex J, #64 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex K, #65 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex L, #66 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex M, #67 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex N, #68 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex O, #69 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex P, #70 Exhibit ECF 4577 - Ex Q, #71 Exhibit ECF 4579 - Bard's MOL ISO Daubert Mot - Margolis, #72 Exhibit ECF 4594 - Pls' Not of Adopt - Resp to El Ghannam Daubert Mot, #73 Exhibit ECF 4635 - Pls' Resp to Margolis Daubert - Wave 4, #74 Exhibit ECF 4693 - Bard NOA - Reply ISO El Ghannam Daub Mot, #75 Exhibit ECF 5102 - Opinion re Bard's El Ghannam Daubert Motion, #76 Exhibit ECF 6373 - Opinion re Bard's Margolis Daubert Motion, #77 Exhibit ECF 6553 - Bard NOA - El Ghann Mot Wave 7, #78 Exhibit ECF 6558 - Bard NOA Reeves Daubert Mot Wave 7, #79 Exhibit ECF 6667 - Pls NOA Resp to El Ghannam Daubert Mot Wave 7, #80 Exhibit ECF 6674 - Pl Not of Adopt - Resp to Reeves Daubert for Wave 7, #81 Exhibit ECF 6674 - Ex 1_1, #82 Exhibit ECF 6674 - Ex 1_2, #83 Exhibit ECF 6771 - Bard NOA Reply ISO El Ghannam Daub Mot W7, #84 Exhibit ECF 6776 - Bard NOA Reply ISO Reeves Daub Mot W7, #85 Exhibit ECF 7286 - Bard's Daubert Mot - El Ghannam Wave 8, #86 Exhibit ECF 7286 - Ex A, #87 Exhibit ECF 7286 - Ex B, #88 Exhibit ECF 7286 - Ex C, #89 Exhibit ECF 7286 - Ex D, #90 Exhibit ECF 7286 - Ex E, #91 Exhibit ECF 7287 - Bard's MOL ISO Daubert Mot - El Ghannam Wave 8, #92 Exhibit ECF 7294 - Pls NOA Resp to El Ghannam Daub Mot W8, #93 Exhibit ECF 7398 - Bard NOA El Ghannam Daubert Mot W9, #94 Exhibit ECF 7399 - Bard's MOL ISO Daubert Mot - El Ghannam Wave 9, #95 Exhibit ECF 7422 - Bard's Daubert Mot - Reeves - W9, #96 Exhibit ECF 7423 - Bard's MOL ISO Daubert Mot -Reeves Wave 9, #97 Exhibit ECF 7443 - Pls NOA Resp to El Ghannam Daubert Mot W9, #98 Exhibit ECF 7449 - Pl Not of Adopt - Resp to Reeves Daubert for Wave 9, #99 Exhibit ECF 7449 - Ex 1_1, #100 Exhibit ECF 7449 - Ex 1_2, #101 Exhibit ECF 7491 - Bard Reply ISO Reeves Daub Mot W9, #102 Exhibit ECF 7493 - Bard Reply ISO El Ghannam Daub Mot W9, #103 Exhibit ECF 7524 - Bard Reeves Daub Mot W10, #104 Exhibit ECF 7525 - Bard's MOL ISO Daubert Mot -Reeves Wave 10, #105 Exhibit ECF 7543 - Bard El Ghannam Daubert Mot W10, #106 Exhibit ECF 7545 - Bard's MOL ISO Daubert Mot -El Ghannam Wave 10, #107 Exhibit ECF 7564 - Pls' NoA Resp El Ghannam Daub Mot W10, #108 Exhibit ECF 7570 - Pl Not of Adopt - Resp to Reeves Daubert for Wave 10, #109 Exhibit ECF 7570 - Ex 1_1, #110 Exhibit ECF 7570 - Ex 1_2, #111 Exhibit ECF 7580 - Bard Reply ISO Reeves Daub Mot W10, #112 Exhibit ECF 7581 - Bard's Reply ISO Daubert Mot -El Ghannam Wave 10)(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 126 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - BSC PTO-11 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - BSC PTO-13 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - BSC PTO-14 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 4955 - BSC PTO-175 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 4987 - BSC PTO-176 (Notice of Correction of Error in PTO-175 - Wave 4 Cases), #8 Exhibit ECF 6100 - BSC PTO-187 - Amended Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #9 Exhibit ECF 6984 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Badylak, #10 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #11 Exhibit ECF 7067 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Badylak, #12 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #14 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #15 Exhibit ECF 7000 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Caraballo, #16 Exhibit ECF 4831 - Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf_s MTE re Caraballo, #17 Exhibit ECF 7063 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Caraballo, #18 Exhibit ECF 4973 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #19 Exhibit ECF 5029 - Pltf_s Reply to BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #20 Exhibit ECF 6042 - Memo Opinion and Order re Caraballo, #21 Exhibit ECF 6986 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Rosenblatt, #22 Exhibit ECF 4833 - Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt and Memo in Support, #23 Exhibit ECF 7061 -BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Rosenblatt, #24 Exhibit ECF 4978 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt, #25 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh A, #26 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh B, #27 Exhibit ECF 5039 - Pltf_s Reply Brief in Support of MTE Rosenblatt, #28 Exhibit ECF 6047 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. P. Rosenblatt, #29 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #30 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #31 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #32 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #33 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #34 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #35 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #36 Exhibit ECF 7002 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE re Dr. J. Blaivas, #37 Exhibit ECF 4822 - BSC_s Motion and Memo in Support MTE Blaivas, #38 Exhibit ECF 7042 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Blaivas, #39 Exhibit ECF 4962 - Pltf_s Opp to BSC_s MTE Blaivas, #40 Exhibit ECF 6029 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Blaivas, #41 Exhibit ECF 7010 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Mays, #42 Exhibit ECF 4805 - BSC_s Memo in Support of MTE Mays, #43 Exhibit ECF 7065 - Plaintiff's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Mays, #44 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 1, #45 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 2, #46 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 3, #47 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 4, #48 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 5, #49 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 6, #50 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 7, #51 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 8, #52 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 9, #53 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 10, #54 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #55 Exhibit ECF 6036 - Memo Opinion and Order Mays, #56 Exhibit ECF 7018 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Pence, #57 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #58 Exhibit ECF 7047 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #59 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #60 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #61 Exhibit ECF 7005 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior MTE Trepeta, #62 Exhibit ECF 4811 - BSC_s MTE Trepeta and Memo in Support, #63 Exhibit ECF 7049 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Response re Trepeta, #64 Exhibit ECF 4963 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Trepeta, #65 Exhibit ECF 6050 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Trepeta, #66 Exhibit ECF 216 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #67 Exhibit ECF 275 - BSC_s Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #68 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh A, #69 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B, #70 Exhibit ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions))(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/19/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/18/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/5/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 124 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #119 Response In Opposition. (Segura, Mildred) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to correct link and to convert event to reply to response) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 123 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #116 Response In Opposition. (Segura, Mildred) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to correct link and to convert event to reply to response) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 122 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #118 Response In Opposition. (Segura, Mildred) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to correct link and to convert event to reply to response) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 121 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #115 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit L)(Segura, Mildred) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to correct link and to convert event to reply to response) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 120 REPLY by Katrina Hinnewinkel to #117 Opposition. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 119 RESPONSE by Katrina Hinnewinkel in opposition to #109 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment, or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 118 RESPONSE by Katrina Hinnewinkel in opposition to #104 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions and Testimony of Keith Reeves, M.D. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 117 OPPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. in opposition to #103 MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Patrick Culligan, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Expert Report of Culligan, #2 Exhibit B- Amended Curriculum Vitae of Patrick Culligan, #3 Exhibit C- Culligan Alyte Article, #4 Exhibit D- March 2020 Long Term Outcomes of Robotic Article, #5 Exhibit E- Amended Exhibit B to Culligan Report, #6 Exhibit F- June 6, 2019 Culligan Transcript Report, #7 Exhibit G- Bossier Email)(Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 116 RESPONSE by Katrina Hinnewinkel in opposition to #107 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael T. Margolis, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 115 RESPONSE by Katrina Hinnewinkel in opposition to #101 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions and Testimony of Ahmed EL-Ghannam, PH.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Rebuttal Report and Response of Dr. El-Ghannam)(Potts, Derek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER directing that the #113 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Extend Deadlines is granted and the following deadlines now apply: Responses to dispositive motions due by 5/26/2020. Responses to Daubert motions due by 5/26/2020. Replies to dispositive motions due by 6/2/2020. Replies to Daubert motions due by 6/2/2020. The Clerk is directed to remove the 2327 Wave 13 flag and place the 2326 DCO flag. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/24/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 113 JOINT MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation, Katrina Hinnewinkel to Modify Scheduling Order and Extend Deadlines #112 Order. (Segura, Mildred) (Modified on 4/23/2020 to add party filers) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #111 JOINT MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel to Extend Time to File Response/Reply to April 24, 2020 (Responses) and May 1, 2020 (Replies), as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/24/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 111 JOINT MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel, Boston Scientific Corporation, C. R. Bard, Inc. to Extend Deadlines. (Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 3/24/2020 to add party filers) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #109 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment, or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment, or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #107 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael T. Margolis, M.D. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael T. Margolis, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Katrina Hinnewinkel in support of #103 MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Patrick Culligan, M.D. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #104 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions and Testimony of Keith Reeves, M.D. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 104 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions and Testimony of Keith Reeves, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Patrick Culligan, M.D. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #101 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions and Testimony of Ahmed EL-Ghannam, PH.D. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions and Testimony of Ahmed EL-Ghannam, PH.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Katrina Hinnewinkel of Patrick Culligan, M.D. on March 5, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. (EST) (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 99 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Katrina Hinnewinkel of Dr. Maureen Reitman on March 4, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (CST) (Attachment: #1 Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action)(Potts, Derek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Katrina Hinnewinkel of Dr. Maureen Reitman on March 4, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (CST) (Potts, Derek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 97 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #96 Response In Opposition. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 96 RESPONSE by Katrina Hinnewinkel in opposition to #94 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Strike Dr. Ahmed El-Ghannam's Rebuttal Report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Potts, Derek) (Modified on 2/5/2020 to remove link to #95 memorandum in support) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #94 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Strike Dr. Ahmed El-Ghannam's Rebuttal Report. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 94 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Strike Dr. Ahmed El-Ghannam's Rebuttal Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 93 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Katrina Hinnewinkel to Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Dr. Keith O. Reeves. (Potts, Derek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Katrina Hinnewinkel of John Montag on To Be Determined at TBD (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Katrina Hinnewinkel of Jesse Wagner on To Be Determined at TBD (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Susan Chrysler on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Susan Chrysler on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #85 JOINT MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc., Katrina Hinnewinkel, Boston Scientific Corporation to Extend the Deposition and Motion Deadlines. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/12/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc., Katrina Hinnewinkel, Boston Scientific Corporation in support of #85 JOINT MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc., Katrina Hinnewinkel, Boston Scientific Corporation to Extend the Deposition and Motion Deadlines. (Segura, Mildred) (Modified on 12/10/2019 to add party filers) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 85 JOINT MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc., Katrina Hinnewinkel, Boston Scientific Corporation to Extend the Deposition and Motion Deadlines. (Segura, Mildred) (Modified on 12/10/2019 to add party filers) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Calsie Boyd on behalf of Katrina Hinnewinkel. (Potts, Derek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 83 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Katrina Hinnewinkel to Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Dr. Ahmed El-Ghannam. (Potts, Derek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Amended Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER The #67 MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel for Modification of #61 Order is GRANTED as construed to the extent plaintiff seeks leave to disclose seven (7) experts and is otherwise DENIED; the #75 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Strike Supplemental Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses is DENIED; the remaining scheduling deadlines in Pretrial Order Number 346 remain in force and effect for all parties. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/8/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 80 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #78 Response In Opposition. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 79 RESPONSE by C. R. Bard, Inc. in opposition to #74 Objection. (Chillingworth, Courtland) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE by Katrina Hinnewinkel in opposition to #75 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Strike Supplemental Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Courtland Carter Chillingworth on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Chillingworth, Courtland) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #75 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Strike Supplemental Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Kirby, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Strike Supplemental Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kirby, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 74 OBJECTIONS to #65 Notice of Videotaped Deposition Duces Tecum of Michael Thomas Margolis, M.D. and #66 Cross-Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Michael T. Margolis, M.D. by Katrina Hinnewinkel. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Katrina Hinnewinkel for Supplemental Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Katrina Hinnewinkel for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Potts, Derek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 71 REPLY by Katrina Hinnewinkel to #69 and #70 Responses In Opposition. (Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 9/26/2019 to remove link to #67 motion) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 70 OPPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation to #67 MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel for Modification of #61 Order. (Strongman, Jon) (Modified on 9/23/2019 to correct link) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 69 OPPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #67 MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel for Modification of #61 Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kirby, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 PRETRIAL ORDER # 346 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 13 Cases) The Pretrial Order # 341 is AMENDED to correct a typographical error in Paragraph A (Scheduling Deadlines); the court has removed cases from the original Exhibit A that have since closed; the remaining provisions related to Wave 13 remain in effect and are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/10/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel for Modification of #61 Order. (Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 9/9/2019 to add link to #61 order) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 66 CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Michael T. Margolis, M.D. on 10/19/2019 at 7:00 p.m. (Brown, Michael) (Modified on 9/6/2019 to remove link to #65 notice and to convert event to notice to take or amend deposition) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Michael Thomas Margolis on 10/19/2019 at 7:00 pm (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Katrina Hinnewinkel of Ronald Bracken on 09/06/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Potts, Derek) (Modified on 9/4/2019 to convert event to notice to take or amend deposition) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 63 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by Katrina Hinnewinkel of Defendant C.R. Bard on August 30, 2019 at 9:00 am (EST) (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER The #55 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Protective Order Quashing Notice of Deposition is granted in part and denied in part; Plaintiff shall be permitted to depose Mr. Bracken regarding the Alyte product; Mr. Bracken's deposition shall take place after the deposition of Bard's corporate designee; Mr. Bracken's testimony shall be limited to his personal knowledge; it shall not be a rehash of the questions posed to the corporate designee; Mr. Bracken shall not be asked questions that he already answered at his prior deposition; the parties shall meet and confer on a convenient place, date, and time for the deposition and shall comply with the relevant pretrial orders in place in this MDL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/15/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER directing that plaintiff's #49 Motion to Extend Expert Witness Designation Deadline and for Modification of the Deadlines Contained in Pretrial Order # 202 should be GRANTED in part pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for good cause shown and DENIED in part; the court ORDERS that plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED insofar as she requests an extension to the scheduling deadlines, but is otherwise DENIED; the court ORDERS as follows: SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 07/18/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 07/25/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 08/09/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 10/08/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 11/07/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 11/14/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 12/13/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 12/20/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 01/03/2020. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 01/10/2020. Filing of Daubert motions due by 12/20/2020. Responses to Daubert motions due by 01/03/2020. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 01/10/2020. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due by 11/4/2019, and any response is due by 11/18/2019. Any reply is due by 11/25/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no late than 11/5/2019, and are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 11/15/2019. The Clerk is directed to remove any existing wave, closed or inactive flags from this case and place the Ethicon Wave 13 flag. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/12/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #59 Reply to Response. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 59 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #58 Response In Opposition. (Segura, Mildred) (Modified on 7/6/2019 to remove link to #55 motion and #57 Brief) (ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE by Katrina Hinnewinkel in opposition to #55 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Protective Order Quashing Notice of Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Potts, Derek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. re: #55 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Protective Order Quashing Notice of Deposition (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Notice of Deposition of Michael Hibner, M.D. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 14, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #55 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Protective Order Quashing Notice of Deposition. (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Protective Order Quashing Notice of Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Notice of Deposition of Timothy B. Hutchings, D.O. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 53 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Katrina Hinnewinkel of Paul Schroeder, MD on July 12, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (PDT) (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 52 OPPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. in opposition to #49 MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel to Extend Expert Witness Designation Deadline and for Modification of the Deadlines Contained in Pretrial Order # 202 (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Katrina Hinnewinkel for Supplemental Second Amended Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Notice of Deposition of Dr. Ja-Hong Kim. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel to Extend Expert Witness Designation Deadline and for Modification of the Deadlines Contained in Pretrial Order # 202 (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Derek H. Potts on behalf of Katrina Hinnewinkel. (Potts, Derek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Certificate of Service for Notice of Deposition. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Katrina Hinnewinkel for Objections and Responses to Boston Scientific Corp.'s First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production Documents. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Katrina Hinnewinkel of Paul Schroeder, MD on June 7, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (PDT) (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Objections & Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and First Set of Requests for Admissions. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Katrina Hinnewinkel for Objections and Responses to Defendant C. R. Bard's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Notice of Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Defendant C.R. Bard and Document Request. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel C. Kirby on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Kirby, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mildred Segura on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Segura, Mildred) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael K. Brown on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Brown, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PRETRIAL ORDER # 202 (Docket Control Order Boston Scientific Corporation Wave 6 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to Boston Scientific Corporation, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as "Wave 6 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all BSC Wave 6 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES.. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 6 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 6 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 JOINT MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc., Katrina Hinnewinkel, Boston Scientific Corporation to Include this Case in the Next Wave in the Boston Scientific Corp.; directing that this case be removed from Boston Scientific Wave 4; it will be placed in the next Boston Scientific Wave; denying as moot #24 JOINT MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel, Boston Scientific Corporation for Stay #20 Pretrial Order # 187 Deadlines. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 35 JOINT MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc., Katrina Hinnewinkel, Boston Scientific Corporation to Include this Case in the Next Wave in the Boston Scientific Corp. (Cohen, Lori) (Modified on 1/29/2019 to add party filers) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Robert J. Mollohan, Jr. as Counsel for C. R. Bard, Inc. (Mollohan, Robert) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Daniel I.A. Smulian on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc. (Smulian, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Katrina Hinnewinkel of C. R Bard, Inc. on 2/25/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and Document Request (Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 12/21/2018 to convert event to notice of deposition) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Katrina Hinnewinkel for Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to C. R. Bard, Inc. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Katrina Hinnewinkel of Jesse Wagner on a date and at a time to be determined but no later than April 29, 2019. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Robert Jennings Mollohan, Jr on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc. (Mollohan, Robert) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Lori G. Cohen on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL ORDER # 294 (Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Unresolved Cases) The settlement conferences will be conducted as follows: 1. For the cases identified on Exhibit A, attached hereto, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 11/7/2018, at 9:00 a.m. in room 6200B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter; 2. For the cases identified on Exhibit B, attached hereto, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 11/8/2018, at 9:00 a.m. in room 6200B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter; 3. For the cases identified on Exhibit C, attached hereto, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 11/9/2018, at 9:00 a.m. in room 6200B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter; it is ORDERED that (1) individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference with counsel of record as reflected on the docket sheet for that plaintiff's case; and (2) any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice; it is further ORDERED that if the parties reach a settlement in a case listed on Exhibits A, B or C, submission of an inactive docket order for that case will relieve plaintiff and her counsel from the obligation of attending the mandatory settlement conference; finally, it is ORDERED that the cases identified as resolved and pending dismissal, identified in the attached Exhibit D, must be dismissed by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/11/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Cases identified on Exhibits A, B, C, and D) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF FRIENDS AND FAMILY by Boston Scientific Corporation of all friends and family members identified in the Plaintiff Fact Sheet, including section VI. Fact Witnesses, and/or identified during the Plaintiff's deposition on dates and at times to be determined. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 24 JOINT MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel, Boston Scientific Corporation for Stay #20 Pretrial Order # 187 Deadlines (Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 8/29/2018 to add party filer) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Katrina Hinnewinkel for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 21 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Katrina Hinnewinkel. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Katrina Hinnewinkel for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Katrina Hinnewinkel for First Set of Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendants. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Richard B. North, Jr. on 5/3/2018. C. R. Bard, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/23/2018, answer due 6/22/2018. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Katrina Hinnewinkel on May 04, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Katrina Hinnewinkel against Boston Scientific Corporation, C. R. Bard, Inc. (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; the Clerk is directed to file the amended complaint on the docket as the date of the Order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/17/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Vacate #10 Inactive Docket Order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/17/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Vacate #10 Inactive Docket Order (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #12 ORDER ENTERED ON 4/17/2018: INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Boston Scientific Corporation have reached a settlement with regard to BSC. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and BSC may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5419 in MDL Case No. 2326 Boston. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) (Modified on 4/17/2018 to note order has been vacated) (mek). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Katrina Hinnewinkel. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Attachment: #1 Amended Complaint)(Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 3/7/2018 to remove link to #1 short form complaint) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 4, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Katrina Hinnewinkel. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon Strongman on 10/11/17. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 10/6/2017, answer due 12/5/2017. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 171 (First Amended Docket Control Order Wave 3 Cases) entered on 09/07/2017 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (crg) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6014067. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinnewinkel v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Hinnewinkel
Represented By: Sheila M. Bossier
Represented By: Calsie Boyd
Represented By: Derek H. Potts
Represented By: Leslie W. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: James H. Keale
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Kate Middleton
Represented By: Mark Joseph Winebrenner
Represented By: Nancy M. Erfle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel I.A. Smulian
Represented By: Michael K. Brown
Represented By: Mildred Segura
Represented By: Robert Jennings Mollohan, Jr.
Represented By: Courtland Carter Chillingworth
Represented By: Lori G. Cohen
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel C. Kirby
Represented By: Eric Swanis
Represented By: Pilar C. French
Represented By: Marilyn A. Moberg
Represented By: Daniel Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?