Paxton v. Hines et al
Plaintiff: Edward Scott Paxton
Defendant: United States of America, Shane S. Hines, Cynthia L. Hines and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01437
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Katie Jo Johnson is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Peter J. Salmon Filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Johnson, Katie)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Peter J. Salmon is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Stanton Crane Shelby Filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Salmon, Peter)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #2 . Answer is due by 10/30/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Shane Hines & Cynthia Hines regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, #3 , Scheduling, 4 . (jkm)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, #3 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 12/23/2020. Dispositive Motions are due by 1/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/23/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/22/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by United States of America. (Conti, Patrick)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV21354 from Jackson County Circuit Court. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)). Filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Conti, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paxton v. Hines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Patrick J. Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane S. Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia L. Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Stanton Crane Shelby
Represented By: Peter J. Salmon
Represented By: Jonathan Mark Radmacher
Represented By: Katie Jo Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Scott Paxton
Represented By: James J Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?