USA v. Two (2) Real Properties, in rem
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Two (2) Real Properties
Petitioner: Farinaz Wadia and Travis Luther
Case Number: 1:2020cv01915
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 Affidavit of Travis Luther. Filed by Travis Luther. (Related document(s): Motion to intervene #8 .) (sss)
December 17, 2020 Filing 9 Affidavit of Farinaz Wadia. Filed by Farinaz Wadia. (Related document(s): Motion to Intervene #7 .) (sss)
December 17, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to Intervene. (Titled by filer as: Application for Leave to Intervene, or Alternative Request for Leave to Join as a real Party in Interest ) Filed by Travis Luther. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (sss)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to Intervene (Titled by filer as: Application for Leave to Intervene, or Alternative Request for Leave to Join as a real Party in Interest ) Filed by Farinaz Wadia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (sss)
December 14, 2020 Filing 12 Claim. Filed by Travis Luther. Answer is due by 1/4/2021. (rs)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 Claim. Filed by Farinaz Wadia. Answer is due by 1/4/2021. (rs)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. This action seeks forfeiture of two properties locations in Jackson County. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2(b) "divisional venue" lies where the property that is the subject matter of action is located. Jackson County is located in the Medford Division of the Court. See L.R. 3-2(a)(4). Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to transfer this matter to the Medford Division as the proper divisional venue. The case, however, will remain assigned to Judge Brown. (slm)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 Notice re Complaint, #1 , in rem, for Forfeiture against Real Property. Filed by United States of America. (Related document(s): Complaint, #1 .) (Jarrett, Julia)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion #3 for Writ of Entry. Writ issued. Signed on 11/6/2020 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Writ of Entry . Filed by USA. (Jarrett, Julia)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (rs)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Complaint, in rem, for Forfeiture. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by USA against Two (2) Real Properties, in rem (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Special Agent Cameron Wall, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jarrett, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Two (2) Real Properties, in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two (2) Real Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Julia E. Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Farinaz Wadia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Travis Luther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?