Medford LLC v. Malcolm & Cisneros, et al
Plaintiff: Medford LLC
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A. and Malcolm & Cisneros
Case Number: 1:2020cv01992
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Motion to Dismiss case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) Filed by Medford LLC. (Curtright, Craig) Modified on 1/12/2021 (jkm). Per counsel incorrect event type.
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss #7 . Response is due by 1/12/2021. Motion is taken under advisement as of 2/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #7 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Curtright, Craig)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Andrew Ho Filed by All Defendants. (Edwards, Amy)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 Declaration of Crystal S. Chase in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Malcolm & Cisneros and U.S. Bank, N.A., as Successor Trustee. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #7 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Chase, Crystal)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Chase, Crystal)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #5 . Answer is due by 12/15/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by All Defendants. (Ho, Andrew)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 11/17/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 3/17/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/16/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/16/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jkm)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC. (Chase, Crystal)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV36441 from Jackson County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7505426 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jackson County Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Articles of Organization, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Chase, Crystal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medford LLC v. Malcolm & Cisneros, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medford LLC
Represented By: Craig D. Curtright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Amy Edwards
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Represented By: Andrew T. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm & Cisneros
Represented By: Amy Edwards
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Represented By: Andrew T. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?