USA v. $131,735 (US)
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $131,735.00 (US) currency and Caitlyn LeCompte
Case Number: 1:2021cv00115
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by Caitlyn LeCompte. (Conrad, Clay)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 Claim. Filed by Caitlyn LeCompte. Answer due 3/22/2021. (Conrad, Clay) Modified on 3/2/2021 to correct docket event and add Answer due date. (slm).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 . Clay S. Conrad on behalf of $131,735.00(US) Currency. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jkm)
February 26, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Clay S. Conrad. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7949883 #4 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Clay S. Conrad. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7949883. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Conrad, Clay)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 Warrant Issued for Arrest and Seizure of Property. Signed by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Complaint, in rem, for Forfeiture (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by USA against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David Wentworth, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Harper, Judith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $131,735 (US)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $131,735.00 (US) currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitlyn LeCompte
Represented By: Clay S Conrad
Represented By: Leland R. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Judith Rose Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?