Sterling Sun Holdings LLC v. Orgro Business Park LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sterling Sun Holdings LLC
Defendant: Orgro Business Park LLC, Vince Webb and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 1:2021cv00442
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Orgro Business Park LLC, Vince Webb. (Joncus, Stephen)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #10 . Answer is due by 5/7/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint. Filed by Orgro Business Park LLC, Vince Webb. (Joncus, Stephen)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service By MAIL Filed by Sterling Sun Holdings LLC. (Alger, Timothy)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service upon Vince Webb served on 3/31/2021 Filed by Sterling Sun Holdings LLC. (Alger, Timothy)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Orgro Business Park LLC served on 3/31/2021, answer due on 4/21/2021. (Alger, Timothy)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #5 . Timothy L. Alger on behalf of Sterling Sun Holdings LLC Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Timothy Alger. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8018558. Filed by Sterling Sun Holdings LLC. (Alger, Timothy)
March 31, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Timothy Alger. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8018558 #5 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and transferred to the Medford Division. (eo)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Orgro Business Park LLC, Vince Webb. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/21/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/20/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 8/20/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 First Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8002881 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sterling Sun Holdings LLC against Sterling Sun Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons 1-Def ORGRO, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons 2-Def Vince). (Alger, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterling Sun Holdings LLC v. Orgro Business Park LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orgro Business Park LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince Webb
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Sun Holdings LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Represented By: Timothy L. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?