Holtsclaw v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jeremy Holtsclaw
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00881
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1364
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Idiart, Damian)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/12/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/12/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 11/12/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (rsm)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8117065 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Jeremy Holtsclaw against United States of America (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Idiart, Damian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holtsclaw v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Holtsclaw
Represented By: Justin I. Idiart
Represented By: Damian M. Idiart
Represented By: Damian Idiart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?