Darex, LLC v. American Freedom, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Darex, LLC
Defendant: American Outfitter, LLC, dba LG Outdoors, American Freedom, LLC, dba Wholesale Hunter, American Freedom, LLC doing business as Wholesale Hunter and American Outfitter, LLC doing business as LG Outdoors
Case Number: 1:2021cv00888
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Referring Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 27 Declaration of Brian N. Platt . Filed by Darex, LLC. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition #26 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Platt, Brian)
August 5, 2021 Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #25 . Filed by Darex, LLC. (Platt, Brian)
July 22, 2021 Filing 25 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Gilmour, Regina)
July 22, 2021 Filing 24 Declaration of Gordan Marsh in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Defendants. (Gilmour, Regina)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #21 . Regina M. Gilmour on behalf of American Freedom, LLC and American Outfitter, LLC. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
July 16, 2021 Filing 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Regina Margaret Gilmour. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8158771. Filed by American Freedom, LLC, American Outfitter, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing) (Gilmour, Regina)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #19 . Answer is due by 7/22/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
July 8, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Snider, Timothy)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane regarding Affidavit of Service #17 , Affidavit of Service #16 . American Freedom LLC & American Outfitter, LLC Answer is due by 7/8/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
June 30, 2021 Filing 17 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #9 upon American Outfitter, LLC served on 6/17/2021 Filed by Darex, LLC. (Platt, Brian)
June 30, 2021 Filing 16 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #8 upon American Freedom, LLC served on 6/17/2021 Filed by Darex, LLC. (Platt, Brian)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to the Register of Copyrights). (bd)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #11 . Brian N. Platt appearing on behalf of Darex, LLC. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 . Timothy D. Nichols appearing on behalf of Darex, LLC. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (bd)
June 16, 2021 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Brian Nelson Platt. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8122326. Filed by Darex, LLC. (Platt, Brian)
June 16, 2021 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Timothy Nichols. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8122320. Filed by Darex, LLC. (Nichols, Timothy)
June 16, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Timothy Nichols. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8122320 #10 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
June 16, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Brian Nelson Platt. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8122326 #11 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to American Outfitter, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to American Freedom, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/13/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/12/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 11/12/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke to Judge Michael J. McShane. (sss)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to American Outfitter, LLC dba LG Outdoors Filed by Darex, LLC. (Jarvis, Darrel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to American Freedom, LLC, dba Wholesale Hunter Filed by Darex, LLC. (Jarvis, Darrel)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Darex, LLC. (Jarvis, Darrel)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,, #1 . Filed by Darex, LLC. (Jarvis, Darrel)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8119002 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA 2-223-798--2014 GR1 Published Photos--Darex, LLC, VA0002234013--Pub Photos Misc Manual Sharp GR1 2019--Darex, LLC, VA 2-223-777--2012 GR1 Published Photos--Darex, LLC. Filed by Darex, LLC against American Freedom, LLC, dba Wholesale Hunter, American Outfitter, LLC, dba LG Outdoors (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H). (Jarvis, Darrel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darex, LLC v. American Freedom, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Outfitter, LLC, dba LG Outdoors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Freedom, LLC, dba Wholesale Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Freedom, LLC doing business as Wholesale Hunter
Represented By: Tyler J. Killeen
Represented By: Regina Margaret Gilmour
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Outfitter, LLC doing business as LG Outdoors
Represented By: Tyler J. Killeen
Represented By: Regina Margaret Gilmour
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darex, LLC
Represented By: Darrel R. Jarvis
Represented By: Brian Nelson Platt
Represented By: Timothy Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?