Lee-Yong v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Petitioner: Jadelynne M. Lee-Yong
Case Number: 1:2021cv01083
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 8/2/2021, answer due on 11/30/2021. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Haapala, John)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jkm)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF #2 ) is GRANTED. Signed 7/23/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Jadelynne M. Lee-Yong. (Haapala, John)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Jadelynne M. Lee-Yong against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Haapala, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee-Yong v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jadelynne M. Lee-Yong
Represented By: John E. Haapala, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?