Scott v. PacifiCorp
Plaintiff: Trustee Winona Rd Tr Joshua M. Scott and Joshua M. Scott
Defendant: PacifiCorp
Case Number: 1:2022cv00174
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Related Cases Under LR 42-2 Filed by PacifiCorp. (Payne, Thomas)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 Reply Defendant's Reply In Support Of Its Motion to Strike to Motion to Strike #5 Oral Argument requested. Filed by PacifiCorp. (Payne, Thomas)
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 Response to Motion to Strike #5 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Selvig, Rachele)
February 8, 2022 Filing 5 Motion to Strike . Oral Argument requested. Filed by PacifiCorp. (Payne, Thomas)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/2/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/5/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 7/5/2022. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jkm)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 2/1/2022 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by PacifiCorp. (Payne, Thomas)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV47743 from Josephine County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8394511 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by PacifiCorp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Payne, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. PacifiCorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Winona Rd Tr Joshua M. Scott
Represented By: Rachele R. Selvig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua M. Scott
Represented By: Rachele R. Selvig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PacifiCorp
Represented By: Troy Greenfield
Represented By: Constance Susan Manos Martin
Represented By: Thomas J. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?