Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Plaintiff: Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center, Cascadia Wildlands, Oregon Wild and Soda Mountain Wilderness Council
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 1:2023cv00519
Filed: April 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Darzen, Meriel)
May 3, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Alexis Romero appearing on behalf of All Defendants Bureau of Land Management. Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Romero, Alexis)
April 11, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Bureau of Land Management. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, #2 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 8/8/2023. Dispositive Motions are due by 9/7/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/8/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/7/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 9/7/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
April 10, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint. for Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center et al Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8886756 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Cascadia Wildlands, Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center, Oregon Wild, Soda Mountain Wilderness Council against BLM (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Furman, Kelsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center
Represented By: Meriel L. Darzen
Represented By: Kelsey Furman
Represented By: Nicholas Stanton Cady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascadia Wildlands
Represented By: Meriel L. Darzen
Represented By: Kelsey Furman
Represented By: Nicholas Stanton Cady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Wild
Represented By: Meriel L. Darzen
Represented By: Kelsey Furman
Represented By: Nicholas Stanton Cady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soda Mountain Wilderness Council
Represented By: Meriel L. Darzen
Represented By: Kelsey Furman
Represented By: Nicholas Stanton Cady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Alexis Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?