Jones v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tammy L. Jones
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2023cv01176
Filed: August 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Karin J. Immergut to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (cw)
August 22, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Justin Lane Martin appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Martin, Justin)
August 21, 2023 Filing 6 Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
August 11, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Kevin C. Danielson appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Danielson, Kevin)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jkm)
August 11, 2023 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Tammy L. Jones. (Taylor, Katie)
August 11, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Tammy L. Jones against Commissioner Social Security Administration Social Security Answer is due by 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Taylor, Katie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy L. Jones
Represented By: Katie Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin
Represented By: Kevin C. Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?