Dolle v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Dolle
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2024cv01295
Filed: August 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Christopher Vieira appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Vieira, Christopher)
August 14, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate of Service by Commissioner Social Security Administration of Attorney Appearance #4 Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Danielson, Kevin)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 8/13/24.) (jy)
August 8, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Kevin C. Danielson appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Danielson, Kevin)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on gave to pro se at counter.) (hm)
August 8, 2024 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Daniel T. Dolle. (hm)
August 8, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner. Filed by Daniel T. Dolle against Commissioner Social Security Administration Social Security Answer is due by 12/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (hm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolle v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Kevin C. Danielson
Represented By: Christopher Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Dolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?