Lane v. Chapman et al
Plaintiff: Richard-Edward Lane
Defendant: Officer Carson Chapman, Officer Alexis Manzanarez, Officer Tim Gildea, Corperal Cody Walker, Coperal Logan Boyd, Garret M. Ramsey and Medford Police Department
Case Number: 1:2025cv00093
Filed: January 17, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JUDGMENT: Based on the record, this action is DISMISSED. Signed on 3/12/2025 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/12/2025.) (ck)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION AND ORDER: Because Plaintiff's Complaint presents claims that ask the Court to interfere with ongoing state court proceedings or to prematurely resolve issues that will be impacted by those proceedings, Defendants' Motion, ECF No. #25 , is GRANTED. Signed on 3/12/2025 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/12/2025.) (ck)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Notice titled "Subpoena to provide documents listed below and as to why." Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Motion to notify I'm Invoking the False Claims Act (FCA). Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 40 This filing includes a conventionally filed USB Flash Drive. This conventional filing is maintained in the Clerk's Office but cannot be made a part of the court's electronic record in CM/ECF., Exhibits re Motion #39 . Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Motion to Remove Opposing Counsels Motion to Dismiss Case. Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Motion for expedited judgment under extraordinary circumstances. Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (rsm)
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Motion to switch Pro-Se Persona to Sui Juris. Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (rsm)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Certificate of Service by All Defendants of Reply to Motion #35 Filed by All Defendants. (Mitton, Eric)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Reply to Motion to Dismiss #25 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Mitton, Eric)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Certificate of Service by All Defendants of Response in Opposition to Motion #32 Filed by All Defendants. (Mitton, Eric)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Declaration of Eric B. Mitton . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #32 .) (Mitton, Eric)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Response in Opposition to Motion #27 . Filed by All Defendants. (Mitton, Eric)
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Certificate of Service by Richard-Edward Lane of Response to Motion #28 , Motion #27 Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Return of Service Executed as to Garret M. Ramsey served on 2/14/2025, answer due on 3/7/2025. (hm)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Return of Service Executed as to Carson Chapman served on 2/15/2025, answer due on 3/10/2025. (hm)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Response to Motion to Dismiss #25 . Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Motion to Remove Opposing Counsel. Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Certificate of Service by All Defendants of Motion to Dismiss #25 Filed by All Defendants. (Mitton, Eric)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Motion to Dismiss . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - conferral, #2 Exhibit 2 - conferral, #3 Exhibit 3 - Toothaker declaration) (Mitton, Eric)
February 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Scheduling Order regarding Certificate of Service #20 , Certificate of Service #19 , Certificate of Service #16 , Certificate of Service #15 , Certificate of Service #18 , Certificate of Service #21 . Answer is due by 2/19/2025. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (hm)
February 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Amended Summons Issued as to Carson Chapman. (hm)
February 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certificate of Service by Richard-Edward Lane of Summons Issued #7 . Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Certificate of Service by Richard-Edward Lane of Summons Issued #10 . Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Certificate of Service by Richard-Edward Lane of Summons Issued #5 . Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Certificate of Service by Richard-Edward Lane of Summons Issued #9 . Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Certificate of Service returned unexecuted by Richard-Edward Lane of Summons Issued #8 . Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm) Modified on 2/10/2025 to fix docket text(hm).
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Certificate of Service by Richard-Edward Lane of Summons Issued #11 Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Certificate of Service by Richard-Edward Lane of Summons Issued #6 Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/29/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/30/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 6/30/2025. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 01/29/2025.) (hm)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Medford Police Department. (hm)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Cody Walker. (hm)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Tim Gildea. (hm)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Carson Chapman. (hm)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Logan Boyd. (hm)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alexis Manzanarez. (hm)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Garret M. Ramsey. (hm)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Motion to Revoke Application for IFP. Filing Fee paid. #12 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (rsm)
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion to Revoke Application for IFP #2 . Filing fee paid-Receipt #5022. Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (rsm)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 01/22/2025.) (hm)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Richard-Edward Lane. (hm)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Richard-Edward Lane against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (hm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Chapman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard-Edward Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Carson Chapman
Represented By: Eric B. Mitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Alexis Manzanarez
Represented By: Eric B. Mitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tim Gildea
Represented By: Eric B. Mitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corperal Cody Walker
Represented By: Eric B. Mitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coperal Logan Boyd
Represented By: Eric B. Mitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garret M. Ramsey
Represented By: Eric B. Mitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medford Police Department
Represented By: Eric B. Mitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?