Givens v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Gregory Lee Givens
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv00581
Filed: April 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Pendleton (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul Papak
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 g Review of Commissioner's Final Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees 47 . Plaintiff's counsel is awarded $49,585.50 under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Signed on 6/10/24 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ***VACATED*** ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees 47 . Plaintiff's counsel is awarded $49,585.50 under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Signed on 6/5/24 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm) Modified on 6/5/2024 . (gm)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Granting the parties' Stipulated Application for Supplemental Fees Pursuant to EAJA 44 . Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412, an additional $5,718.82 is awarded to Plaintiff in care of his a ttorney, Nancy J. Meserow, as supplemental EAJA fees, to be paid in addition to, and not instead of, EAJA fees and costs previously awarded in the amount $17,260.12 and $182.24 respectively. Signed on 2/1/23 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation 39 . Plaintiff's motion for fees and expenses 33 is Granted. EAJA fees and costs are awarded in the amounts of $17,260.12 and $182.24, respectively. Signed on 12/28/22 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Russo's Findings and Recommendation 18 . The decision of the Commissioner is affirmed and this case is dismissed. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 6/26/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (pvh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Givens v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Represented By: Alexis L. Toma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lee Givens
Represented By: Nancy J. Meserow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?