Ramirez v. Washburn

Plaintiff: Jose Ramirez
Defendant: Sue Washburn and State of Oregon
Case Number: 2:2018cv02071
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 Answer to #7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand And Affirmative Defenses. Filed by State of Oregon, Sue Washburn. (Vincent, Shannon)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Jose Ramirez against Sue Washburn, State of Oregon. (Walsh, Lynn)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sue Washburn. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 is GRANTED. Signed on 12/10/18 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Jose Ramirez. (Walsh, Lynn)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (ecp)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Jose Ramirez. (Walsh, Lynn)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. (In forma pauperis status selected) Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jose Ramirez against Sue Washburn (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Walsh, Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Washburn
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oregon
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ramirez
Represented By: Lynn S. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?