Sokell v. Amsberry
Petitioner: Douglas Wayne Sokell
Respondent: Brigitte Amsberry
Case Number: 2:2018cv02118
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Nick M. Kallstrom is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brigitte Amsberry. (Kallstrom, Nicholas)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Oliver W. Loewy is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Douglas Wayne Sokell. (Loewy, Oliver)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brigitte Amsberry. Filed by Brigitte Amsberry. (Larsen, Lynn)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Douglas Wayne Sokell of Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel #4 and Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order #6 . (gw)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 (ECF No. #1 ) on respondent. Answer is due by 3/4/2019. Signed on 1/3/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment Form, #2 Petition) (gw)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice via interoffice mail to Federal Public Defender of Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel #4 and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 . (gw)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #2 ). Added attorney Lisa Hay for Douglas Wayne Sokell. Signed on 1/3/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Attachment: #1 Petition) (gw)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (copy mailed to petitioner) (kms)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Douglas Wayne Sokell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (kms)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) Filing Fee in amount of $5 collected. Receipt No. 81288 issued. Filed by Douglas Wayne Sokell against Brigitte Amsberry. (kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sokell v. Amsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas Wayne Sokell
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Oliver W. Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brigitte Amsberry
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Nicholas M. Kallstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?