Cole v. Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC
Plaintiff: Donald Cole, Jr.
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02121
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 Amended Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC. (Kunkel, Ryan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC. (Kunkel, Ryan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC. (Kunkel, Ryan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 14 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Kelsey Israel-Trummel (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: kitrummel. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kelsey Israel-Trummel for Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5687798 issued. Signed on 1/7/2019 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (ecp)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marnie R. Phillips for Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5687805 issued. Signed on 1/7/2019 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (ecp)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron L. Agenbroad for Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 979-5687783 issued. Signed on 1/7/2019 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (ecp)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #6 is GRANTED. Answer is due by 1/16/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marnie Phillips . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5687805. Filed by Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC. (Kunkel, Ryan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelsey Israel-Trummel . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5687798. Filed by Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC. (Kunkel, Ryan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aaron Agenbroad . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5687783. Filed by Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC. (Kunkel, Ryan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC. (Kunkel, Ryan)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Amended Affidavit of Service upon Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC served on 12/12/2018 Correcting name of served party. Filed by Donald Cole, Jr. (Montrone, Sara)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service upon Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC served on 12/12/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Montrone, Sara) Modified on 12/28/2018 to correct service upon defendant (ct).
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/10/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/10/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/10/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (ecp)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5664582 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Cole Donald, Jr against Cole Donald, Jr (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Montrone, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Cole, Jr.
Represented By: Sara Montrone
Represented By: Joel W. Christiansen
Represented By: Jim W. Vogele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Food Company LLC
Represented By: Ryan Kunkel
Represented By: Marnie R. Phillips
Represented By: Aaron L. Agenbroad
Represented By: Kelsey Israel-Trummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?