Torres v. Cain

Petitioner: Richard Torres
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2018cv02186
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Anthony D. Bornstein is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Richard Torres. (Bornstein, Anthony)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Finding as Moot Motion for Extension of Time #11 . By Order dated 1/30/2019, petitioner has been appointed counsel and granted an extension of time in which to respond to the Order to Show Cause. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ps3)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 Declaration of Jason Schaefer. Filed by Richard Torres. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #11 .) (dsg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Richard Torres. (dsg)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Motion for Appointment of FPD #8 . Petitioner's response to the Order to Show Cause is due by April 1, 2019. Signed on 1/30/19 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Richard Torres, Prisoner ID: 19852458) (kf)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Richard Torres. Filed by Richard Torres. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel #8 .)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Torres, Prisoner ID: 19852458) (dsg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Richard Torres.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Torres, Prisoner ID: 19852458) (dsg)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order to Show Cause in Writing within 30 days why his federal habeas petition should not be dismissed as untimely and barred by the one-year statute of limitations. Order denying as moot Application to Proceed IFP #1 and denying Motion to Appoint Counsel #3 , with leave to renew. Signed on 1/9/19 by Judge Ann L. Aiken.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Torres, Prisoner ID: 19852458) (kf) Modified to add link to entry #3 on 1/9/2019. (kf)
December 26, 2018 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 81555 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Torres, Prisoner ID: 19852458) (jn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of E-mailing to Richard Torres, Prisoner ID: 19852458 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party, #5 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Torres, Prisoner ID: 19852458) (dsg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to SRCI for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Richard Torres, Prisoner ID: 19852458) (dsg)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Torres, Prisoner ID: 19852458) (dsg)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Richard Torres.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Torres, Prisoner ID: 19852458) (dsg)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Richard Torres against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Torres, Prisoner ID: 19852458) (dsg)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Richard Torres.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Torres, Prisoner ID: 19852458) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Torres
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Anthony D. Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?