De la Mora v. KW Transportation, LLC
Plaintiff: Luis Daniel Trejo De la Mora
Defendant: KW Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02228
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Luis Daniel Trejo De la Mora. (Idiart, Damian)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by KW Transportation, LLC. (Gilroy, Patrick)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/3/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/3/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/3/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (jtj)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Gilroy, Patrick)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5683041 issued.. Filed by KW Transportation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint EX A, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint EX B, #3 Exhibit Summons EX C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Gilroy, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De la Mora v. KW Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Daniel Trejo De la Mora
Represented By: Damian M. Idiart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KW Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Wade R. Keenon
Represented By: Patrick D. Gilroy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?