Ferguson v. Bowser

Petitioner: Jedadya Ferguson
Respondent: Mr T. Bowser
Case Number: 2:2019cv00061
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 Transcript of State Court Proceedings . (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Aaron, James)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 Exhibits 101 - 128. Filed by T. Bowser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit Part 3 of 3) (Aaron, James)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CJA 20: Order Granting Substitution: IT IS ORDERED that CJA Panel attorney Bear Wilner-Nugent is appointed pursuant to the provisions of the Criminal Justice Act, 18 U.S.C. 3006A, as substitute counsel, relieving Federal Public Defender Lisa Hay for Jedadya Ferguson, effective February 1, 2019. Signed on 2/1/2019 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (dsg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney James M. Aaron is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by T. Bowser. (Aaron, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of T. Bowser. Filed by T. Bowser. (Larsen, Lynn)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 3/25/2019. Signed on 1/22/19 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition) (dsg)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel #3 is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent Petitioner in this proceeding. Signed on 1/22/19 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed order to petitioner) (Sent order and petition to FPD via interoffice mail) (dsg)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Petitioner.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Jedadya Ferguson. (joha)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jedadya Ferguson. Filed by Jedadya Ferguson. (joha)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected. Receipt No. 81818 issued. Filed by Jedadya Ferguson against T. Bowser. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jedadya Ferguson
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Bear Wilner-Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr T. Bowser
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: James M. Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?