Cale v. Cain

Petitioner: Harvey Steven Cale
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv00205
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John Jelderks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Harvey Steven Cale.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Harvey Cale, Prisoner ID: 14303123) (dsg)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney James M. Aaron is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain.**PRINT ALL**(Harvey Cale, Prisoner ID: 14303123) (Aaron, James)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain.**PRINT ALL**(Harvey Cale, Prisoner ID: 14303123) (Larsen, Lynn)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Petitioners Motion for Appointment of Counsel (#2 ) is DENIED without prejudice to his right to refile the Motion after Respondent has filed an answer or other responsive pleading. Answer is due by 5/10/2019. Signed on 3/11/2019 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition)**31 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Harvey Cale, Prisoner ID: 14303123) (joha)
March 4, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 82568 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Harvey Cale, Prisoner ID: 14303123) (ljc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Harvey Cale, Prisoner ID: 14303123) (dsg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Harvey Steven Cale.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Harvey Cale, Prisoner ID: 14303123) (dsg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Harvey Steven Cale against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Harvey Cale, Prisoner ID: 14303123) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cale v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harvey Steven Cale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: James M. Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?