Smith v. Popoff

Petitioner: Larry Dale Smith, Jr.
Respondent: Christine Popoff
Case Number: 2:2019cv00207
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 82741 issued. (ljc)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney James M. Aaron is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Christine Popoff. (Aaron, James)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Anthony D. Bornstein is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Larry Dale Smith, Jr. (Bornstein, Anthony)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Christine Popoff. Filed by Christine Popoff. (Larsen, Lynn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #5 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment (at the time of filing the incorrect case scheduling order was attached to the docket entry). The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #1 and Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 are granted. FPD appointed to represent petitioner. Answer is due by 4/30/2019. Signed on 2/28/19 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance/Acknowledgement Form, #2 2254 Petition)**29 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Larry Smith, Prisoner ID: 8512037) (kf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2019: # 3 correct pdf) (kf). (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/1/2019) (cw).
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Larry Smith, Prisoner ID: 8512037) (dsg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Larry Dale Smith, Jr.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Larry Smith, Prisoner ID: 8512037) (dsg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Larry Dale Smith, Jr against Christine Popoff.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Larry Smith, Prisoner ID: 8512037) (dsg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Larry Dale Smith, Jr.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Larry Smith, Prisoner ID: 8512037) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Popoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christine Popoff
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: James M. Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Dale Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Anthony D. Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?