Karpinska v. Walker & Sons, LLC
Plaintiff: Dominique Karpinska
Defendant: Walker & Sons, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00913
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: Attorney signature missing. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney DAVID J KAMINSKI . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5941997. Filed by Walker & Sons, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Cert of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Cert of Good Standing) (DeBlasio, David) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/30/2019) (jn). (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/30/2019) (cw).
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Filed by Walker & Sons, LLC. (DeBlasio, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service upon Walker & Sons, LLC served on 7/8/2019 Filed by Dominique Karpinska. (Dennis, Jonathan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Walker & Sons, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Dominique Karpinska. (Dennis, Jonathan)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/10/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/12/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/12/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (joha)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Dominique Karpinska. (Dennis, Jonathan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5886233 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Dominique Karpinska against Walker & Sons, LLC. (Dennis, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karpinska v. Walker & Sons, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker & Sons, LLC
Represented By: David H. DeBlasio
Represented By: David J. Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Karpinska
Represented By: Jonathan M. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?