Larsen v. Cain
Petitioner: John Sorn Larsen
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv00980
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Finding as Moot Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 as the filing fee has been paid. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (ps3)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Oliver W. Loewy is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by John Sorn Larsen. (Loewy, Oliver)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney James M. Aaron is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain. (Aaron, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain. (Larsen, Lynn)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 9/23/2019. Signed on 7/25/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL: Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #3 ) is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main St., Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent petitioner in this proceeding. See 18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2)(B). Signed on 7/25/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (John Larsen, Prisoner ID: 11321568) (joha) (Copy of this Order sent to FPD via interoffice mail on 7/25/2019.)
July 11, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 84621 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Larsen, Prisoner ID: 11321568) (re)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Emailing to John Larsen, Prisoner ID: 11321568 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party #5 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Larsen, Prisoner ID: 11321568) (dsg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to SRCI for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(John Larsen, Prisoner ID: 11321568) (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Larsen, Prisoner ID: 11321568) (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by John Sorn Larsen.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Larsen, Prisoner ID: 11321568) (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by John Sorn Larsen against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Larsen, Prisoner ID: 11321568) (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by John Sorn Larsen.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Larsen, Prisoner ID: 11321568) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larsen v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Sorn Larsen
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Oliver W. Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: James M. Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?