Perez Silva v. Cain
Petitioner: Jose Perez Silva
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv00983
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Samuel A. Kubernick is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain. (Kubernick, Samuel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain. (Larsen, Lynn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Susan F. Wilk is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Jose Perez Silva. (Wilk, Susan)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 . Added Federal Public Defender to represent petitioner Jose Perez Silva. Signed on 7/1/19 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jose Perez Silva, Prisoner ID: 18203834) (kf)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Application to Proceed IFP #1 denied as moot. Answer is due by 8/30/2019. Signed on 7/1/19 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance/Acknowledgement Form, #2 2254 Petition)**18 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jose Perez Silva, Prisoner ID: 18203834) (kf)
June 27, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 84332 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jose Perez Silva, Prisoner ID: 18203834) (ljc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jose Perez Silva, Prisoner ID: 18203834) (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Jose Perez Silva.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jose Perez Silva, Prisoner ID: 18203834) (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Jose Perez Silva against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jose Perez Silva, Prisoner ID: 18203834) (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Jose Perez Silva.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jose Perez Silva, Prisoner ID: 18203834) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez Silva v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Samuel A. Kubernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Perez Silva
Represented By: Susan F. Wilk
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?