Meshell v. Steward et al
Plaintiff: Aloyisus Meshell
Defendant: Jamie Breyman, Joan Barton and Heidi Steward
Case Number: 2:2019cv01063
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #7 . Waiver of Service is due by 9/9/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/9/2019.) (ps1)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Shannon Vincent In Support of Defendants' Motion to Extend Time (First). Filed by Heidi Steward. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #7 .) (Vincent, Shannon)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time (First). Filed by Heidi Steward. (Vincent, Shannon)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service is due by 8/9/2019. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/12/2019. Complaint #2 and this Notice E-Mailed to ODOJ on 7/12/2019) (joha)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND TO COLLECT INMATE FILING FEE: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the Oregon Department of Corrections, Central Trust Unit shall collect payments from Plaintiff's prison trust account and shall forward those payments to the Clerk of the Court in accordance with the formula set forth above until a total of $350.00 has been collected and forwarded to the Clerk of the Court. The payments shall be clearly identified by the name and number assigned to this action. Signed on 7/10/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party and ODOC on 7/12/2019.) (joha)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (kms)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. (IFP Pending) Filed by Aloyisus Meshell against Joan Barton, Jamie Breyman, Heidi Steward (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (kms)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Aloyisus Meshell. (kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meshell v. Steward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aloyisus Meshell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Breyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Steward
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?