Steltz v. Cain
Petitioner: Adam Troy Steltz
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv01064
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CJA 20: Order Granting Substitution of Counsel. Appointment of Attorney Jon H. Weiner for Adam Troy Steltz. Assistant Federal Public Defender Lisa Hay relieved of represenation for Adam Troy Steltz, effective August 15,2019. Signed on 8/26/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/26/2019.) (jkm)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Review of petitioner's application reveals he is unable to afford the costs of this action, and his IFP application #1 is GRANTED. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 is GRANTED for the purposes of filing an amended petition clarifying the grounds for relief and filing supporting briefs in support of the amended petition. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main St., Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent petitioner in this proceeding. Within sixty days from receipt of this Order, petitioner shall file an amended petition, at which time the Court will issue the relevant habeas scheduling order. Signed on 8/6/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (jkm) Modified on 8/7/2019 to add print instructions (dsg).
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Emailing to Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party, #5 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to SRCI for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Adam Troy Steltz.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Adam Troy Steltz against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Adam Troy Steltz.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steltz v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adam Troy Steltz
Represented By: Jon H. Weiner
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?